EP0610292 - METHODS FOR TREATING INFECTIOUS WASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENVIROTRUST TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 10 Toronto Street Toronto Ontario M5C 2B7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states ENVIROTRUST TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 10 Toronto Street Toronto, Ontario M5C 2B7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Erick 12345-121 Street Edmonton, Alberta T5G 2Z4 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke, Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Dipl.-Ing. F. Petersen Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 92921945.9 | 29.10.1992 | [1994/33] | WO1992CA00468 | Priority number, date | US19910785660 | 31.10.1991 Original published format: US 785660 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308849 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610292 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610292 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61L11/00, C05F7/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
A61L11/00 (EP,US);
C05F9/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y10S588/901 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05F9/00, C05F9/02, C05G5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFIZIERTEM ABFALL | [1994/33] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING INFECTIOUS WASTES | [1994/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DECHETS INFECTIEUX | [1994/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.01.1997 | DK | 29.01.1997 | GR | 29.01.1997 | IE | 29.10.1997 | LU | 29.10.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2001/01] | BE | 29.01.1997 | |
DK | 29.01.1997 | ||
GR | 29.01.1997 | ||
IE | 29.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 29.01.1997 | |
DK | 29.01.1997 | ||
GR | 29.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 29.01.1997 | |
DK | 29.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 29.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3953191 (BARTON BENNY M); | [A]US3976465 (O'DONNELL JAMES M); | [A]US4743287 (ROBINSON ELMO C [US]); | [A]US5021077 (MOORE WILLIAM P [US]); | [AP]EP0510277 (WINFIELD IND [US]) |