Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0580972
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.02.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] |
14.02.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] |
09.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.09.1995 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
17.12.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |