EP0580972 - Plastic bucket and process for lining the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schoeller-Plast S.A. 11, route de la Condémine 1680 Romont / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Schoeller-Plast S.A. 11, route de la Condémine CH-1680 Romont / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umiker, Hans Brunnenwiese 31 CH-8132 Egg / CH | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 473 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93107965.1 | 17.05.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | CH19920002398 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: CH 239892 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580972 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580972 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/28, B29C63/14, B29C51/16 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B29C51/162 (EP);
B29C63/0047 (EP);
B29C63/28 (EP);
B65D25/14 (EP);
B65D25/36 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1994/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auskleiden eines Kunststoffeimers sowie Kunststoffeimer zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1994/05] | English: | Plastic bucket and process for lining the same | [1994/05] | French: | Seau en plastique et procédé pour le recouvrir | [1997/14] |
Former [1994/05] | Seau en plastique et procédé pour le recouvrir "le même" | Examination procedure | 08.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0242161 [ ]; | FR2449818 [ ]; | FR2132576 [ ]; | FR2079231 [ ]; | US3866816 [ ]; | DE2528232 [ ]; | US3379798 [ ] (MCNASH HOWARD H) | Examination | DE2558232 |