EP0551942 - Binder comprising an alkyd resin and a resin based on an ethylenically unsaturated monomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofland, Adriaan Chopinstraat 49 NL-8031 ZH Zwolle / NL | 02 /
Van der Linde, Robert Kuyperhuislaan 10 NL-8024 PD Zwolle / NL | 03 /
Bayard, Richard Antonius Schepenlaan 33 NL-8014 JA Zwolle / NL | [1993/29] | Application number, filing date | 93200059.9 | 11.01.1993 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | NL19920000042 | 13.01.1992 Original published format: NL 9200042 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0551942 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0551942 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09D167/08, C09D151/08, C08F283/02 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
C09D181/08 (EP);
C08F283/02 (EP);
C09D167/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/08, C08L2666/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | Bindemittel aus einem Alkydharz und einem Harz auf Basis eines ethylenisch ungesättigtem Monomers | [1993/29] | English: | Binder comprising an alkyd resin and a resin based on an ethylenically unsaturated monomer | [1993/29] | French: | Liant comprenant une résine alkyde et une résine à base d'un monomère insaturé | [1993/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.03.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   06.04.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3123598 ; | [YD]GB2131437 ; | [AD]WO8300151 ; | [A]NL8304021 ; | [A]EP0072979 |