Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0598437
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
24.12.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] |
17.10.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] |
03.01.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] |
10.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.11.1995 |
First examination report |
|
29.10.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] |
08.04.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] |