EP0598437 - Dye-donor element comprising dicyanovinylaniline dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanmaele, Luc, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Janssens, Wilhelmus, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1994/21] | Application number, filing date | 93203136.2 | 10.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | EP19920203567 | 19.11.1992 Original published format: EP 92203567 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598437 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598437 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09B23/14, B41M5/38 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
B41M5/3854 (EP);
C09B23/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/21] | Title | German: | Farbstoffgebendes Element, enthaltend Dicyanovinylanilinfarbstoffe | [1994/21] | English: | Dye-donor element comprising dicyanovinylaniline dyes | [1994/21] | French: | Elément donneur de colorant contenant des colorants de type dicyanovinylaniline | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.02.1997 | NL | 19.02.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1997/49] | BE | 19.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3189641 (A. BRACK ET. AL.) [X] 1,2 * page 3, table, lines 9 - 11 *; | [A]EP0483801 (KODAK COMPANY) [A] 1-4,9 * page 10 * * abstract *; | JPH03230994 [ ] (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP.); | JPH02219692 [ ] (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD.); | [A]JPS6031563 ; | JPS6031563 [ ] (MITSUBISHI KASEI KOGYO K. K.) [ ] * page 6; examples II-13 *; | [A]FR2364998 (CIBA-GEIGY AG) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920309), vol. 116, no. 10, Database accession no. 95913a, page 846 [A] 1-4,9 * abstract * * & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS VOL. 116, FORMULA INDEX, C14-C24 (PART 2 OF 3 PARTS) 1/92-6/92, FORMULA C21H21N3O * * Propanedinitrile, [[4-(butylphenylamino)-2-methoxyphenyl]methylene]- * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910506), vol. 114, no. 18, Database accession no. 166398h, page 116 [A] 1-4,9 * abstract * * & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS TWELFTH COLLECTIVE INDEX, VOLUMES 106-115, 1987-1991, C18H16F3NO5-C19H29N3O3Si * * Propanedinitrile, [[4-[(2-methyl-2-propenyl)phenylamino]phenyl]methylene]- * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850627), vol. 9, no. 153, Database accession no. (C - 288)<1876> , & JP60031563 A 19850218 (MITSUBISHI KASEI KOGYO K. K.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |