EP0599645 - Zero shift compensation circuit and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/22] | Zero shift compensation circuit | ||
[1998/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANAMETRICS, INC. 221 Crescent Street Waltham, MA 02154-3497 / US | [1994/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Emilio 2 via D. Di Nanni I-20090 Assago-Milano / IT | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309411.2 | 25.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920981501 | 25.11.1992 Original published format: US 981501 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0599645 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0599645 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599645 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/74 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G01N27/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/22] | Title | German: | Schaltkreis und Verfahren zur Kompensation der Nullpunktverschiebung | [1998/15] | English: | Zero shift compensation circuit and method | [1998/15] | French: | Circuit et méthode pour la compensation du décalage du point zéro | [1998/15] |
Former [1994/22] | Schaltkreis zur Kompensation des Nullpunktverschiebung | ||
Former [1994/22] | Zero shift compensation circuit | ||
Former [1994/22] | Circuit pour la compensation du décalage du point zéro | Examination procedure | 28.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2949765 (THAYER LOUIS C, et al) [A] 1,9-12* column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4432226 (DEMPSTER PHILIP T [US]) [A] 1,9-12 * abstract *; | [DA]US4893495 (MEYER EMILIO [IT]) [DA] 1,3,4,9-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 29 - line 41; figures 1,2 * |