Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0586315 | Global Dossier | 09.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9210673 | 02.09.1992 | US66051896 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2695266 | 30.09.1994 | B1 | FR2695266 | 04.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9210673 | 02.09.1992 | US66051896 | 07.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5710502 | 20.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US25258994 | 01.06.1994 | FR9210673 | 02.09.1992 | US66051896 | 07.06.1996 |