EP0603125 - Method and apparatus for piecing lap sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOWA MACHINERY LIMITED 32-3, Meieki 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states HOWA MACHINERY LIMITED 32-3, Meieki 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagaki, Kazuhiro 14 Kitateramachi Kuwana-shi, Mie / JP | 02 /
Terao, Osamu 2-7-73 Sakuradai Yottsukaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 03 /
Kishi, Katsutoshi 41 Heijima 4-chome, Ginan-cho Hashima-gun, Gifu / JP | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas & Savoye S.A. 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas Kiehl Savoye & Cronin 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1995/30] | Savoye, Jean-Paul Moinas Kiehl Savoye & Cronin 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge / CH | ||
Former [1994/25] | Dousse, Blasco 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810847.9 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | JP19920353255 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35325592 | JP19930027495 | 21.01.1993 Original published format: JP 2749593 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603125 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603125 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/08 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
D01G19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1994/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Watte-Endenverbindung | [1994/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for piecing lap sheets | [1994/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour rattacher les nappes | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0455171 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [DX] 1-3 * column 8, line 1 - column 27, line 51; figures 1,2,8,17,27; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0482475 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 14 - column 9, line 20; figures 1,3-7 *; | [DA]EP0446354 (HARA SHOKKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2401593 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) |