Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
02.02.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] |
18.01.1995 | Change - inventor | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |
27.10.1994 | First examination report | |
27.05.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] |
27.05.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] |