Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |
05.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
19.06.1997 | Examination report or reply | |
19.04.1997 | Renewal fee | |
25.09.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
12.07.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
05.04.1996 | Renewal fee | |
22.03.1996 | First examination report | |
20.03.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
10.02.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
10.02.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |