Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0644892 | Global Dossier | 29.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9303625 | 23.04.1993 | US89772392 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2137832 | 26.09.2000 | C | CA2137832 | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9303625 | 23.04.1993 | US89772392 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9325574 | Global Dossier | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89772392 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2668003B | Global Dossier | 27.10.1997 | B2 | JPH07507069 | 03.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US89772392 | 12.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI932695 | 13.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US89772392 | 12.06.1992 |