EP0644892 - INHIBITORS OF ANGIOTENSIN I CHYMASE(S) INCLUDING HUMAN HEART CHYMASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOVER, Dennis, J. 169 Cove Road Stonington, CT 06378 / US | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William, et al Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Moore, James William, Dr., et al Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93909587.3 | 23.04.1993 | [1995/13] | WO1993US03625 | Priority number, date | US19920897723 | 12.06.1992 Original published format: US 897723 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325574 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644892 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, C07D401/06, A61K37/64, A61K31/435 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K5/0202 (EP);
C07K5/0205 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Inhibitoren für Angiotensin I-Chymasen inklusive der menschlichen Herzchymase | [1995/13] | English: | INHIBITORS OF ANGIOTENSIN I CHYMASE(S) INCLUDING HUMAN HEART CHYMASE | [1995/13] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'ANGIOTENSINE I-CHYMASE(S), COMPRENANT LA CHYMASE CARDIAQUE HUMAINE | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO9220357 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]); | [X]EP0410411 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]); | [X]EP0145441 (DU PONT [US]) | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 27, no. 20, 4 October 1988, EASTON, PA US pages 7682 - 7688 C.A. KETTNER 'Kinetic Properties of the Binding of alpha-Lytic Protease to Peptide Boronic Acids' | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 33, no. 1, January 1990, WASHINGTON US pages 394 - 407 N.P. PEET ET AL. 'Synthesis of Peptidyl Fluoromethyl Ketones and Peptidyl alpha-Keto Esters as Inhibitors for Porcine Pancreatic Elastase, Human Neutrophil Elastase, and Rat and Human Neutrophil Cathepsin G' | [X] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS vol. 166, no. 2, 30 January 1990, DULUTH, MINNESOTA US pages 595 - 600 S. MEHDI ET AL. 'THE INHIBITION OF HUMAN NEUTROPHIL ELASTASE AND CATHEPSIN G BY PEPTIDYL 1,2-DICARBONYL DERIVATIVES' | [A] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 265, no. 36, 25 December 1990, BALTIMORE, MD US pages 22348 - 22357 H. URATA ET AL. 'Identification of a Highly Specific Chymase as the Mayor Angiotensin II-forming Enzyme in the Human Heart' | [A] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 266, no. 29, 15 October 1991, BALTIMORE, MD US pages 19192 - 19197 A. KINOSHITA ET AL. 'Multiple Determinants for the High Substrate Specificity of an Angiotensin II-forming Chymase from the Human Heart' |