EP0639309 - ASYNCHRONOUS LOGIC CIRCUIT FOR 2-PHASE OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAUER, Karl Nockherweg 21 D-8018 Grafing / DE | [1995/08] | Application number, filing date | 93911426.0 | 30.04.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993DE00380 | Priority number, date | DE19924214981 | 06.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4214981 | [1995/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322838 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639309 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639309 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/096 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
H03K19/0963 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/08] | Title | German: | ASYNCHRONE LOGIKSCHALTUNG FÜR DEN 2-PHASEN-BETRIEB | [1995/08] | English: | ASYNCHRONOUS LOGIC CIRCUIT FOR 2-PHASE OPERATION | [1995/08] | French: | CIRCUIT LOGIQUE ASYNCHRONE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT DIPHASE | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AP]WO9220156 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS Bd. 25, Nr. 3, 2. Februar 1989, STEVENAGE,HERTS.,(GB) Seiten 215 - 217 PATEL ET AL 'evaluation of self-timed systems for vlsi' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS Bd. 23, Nr. 6, 12. März 1987, STEVENAGE,HERTS.,(GB) Seiten 269 - 270 LAU 'self:a self -timed systems design technique' |