Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
08.11.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] |
25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.04.1996 | Renewal fee | |
15.03.1996 | First examination report | |
14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
06.01.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
06.01.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |