Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07506471 | Global Dossier | 13.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 | DE9300380 | 30.04.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0639309 | Global Dossier | 27.12.1996 | B1 | EP0639309 | 22.02.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 | DE9300380 | 30.04.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59304905D1 | 06.02.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 | DE9300380 | 30.04.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5479107 | 26.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 | DE9300380 | 30.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9322838 | Global Dossier | 11.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4214981 | 11.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4214981 | 06.05.1992 |