EP0603376 - SIZE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS CORNING Fiberglas Tower 26 Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | [1996/28] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORPORATION Fiberglas Tower 26 Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSSEMENT, Marc Rue du Bay-Bonnet 28 B-4620 Fleron / BE | 02 /
MASSON, Nadia Rue Chapelle à la Lice 25B B-4621 Retinne / BE | 03 /
PIRET, Willet Rue Falhez 53 B-4652 Xhendelesse / BE | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93915497.7 | 30.06.1993 | [1994/26] | WO1993US06227 | Priority number, date | US19920912559 | 13.07.1992 Original published format: US 912559 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401375 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603376 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603376 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02, C08J5/08, C09D175/04 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
C09D175/06 (EP,US);
C03C25/26 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08L75/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/8061 (EP,US);
C08K9/08, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L33/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/26] | Title | German: | SCHLICHTMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1994/26] | English: | SIZE COMPOSITION | [1994/26] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENSIMAGE | [1994/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 05.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3814592 (KILLMEYER C, et al) [A] 1-6,17,22-25 * column W *; | [A]US3919145 (ECKHOFF PAUL S) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE3336845 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,17,22-25 * the whole document * |