EP0659204 - METHOD FOR INCREASING THE EFFICIENCY OF A DISINFECTANT CLEANING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URFER, Allen, D., c/o Linda White 5697 North Brandywine Road Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | 02 /
LAZAROWITZ, Virginia, L. 103 Kimberly Way Hatfield, PA 19440 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93920361.8 | 01.09.1993 | [1995/26] | WO1993US08034 | Priority number, date | US19920942555 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: US 942555 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405753 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659204 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D1/835, C11D3/22, C11D3/48, C11D11/00 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
C11D3/48 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER WIRKSAMKEIT EINES DESINFEKTIONSMITTELS | [1995/26] | English: | METHOD FOR INCREASING THE EFFICIENCY OF A DISINFECTANT CLEANING COMPOSITION | [1995/26] | French: | PROCEDE D'AUGMENTATION DE L'EFFICACITE D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERSIVE DESINFECTANTE | [1995/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 03.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 02.09.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]USH269H |