Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0640688
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.05.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
30.01.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.06.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
12.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.03.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
27.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.2002 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.04.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
27.11.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.11.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.10.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
12.09.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
01.08.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] |
28.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.01.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] |
13.01.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] |