Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0634879
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.06.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |
04.03.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
30.08.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
09.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
20.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.09.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
25.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] |
19.12.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] |
26.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.05.1996 [1996/21] |
13.04.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] |
02.12.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |