Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07170273 | Global Dossier | 04.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4323471 | 14.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0634879 | Global Dossier | 05.02.1997 | A3 | EP0634879 | 18.01.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4323471 | 14.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4323471 | 17.10.1996 | C2 | DE4323471 | 19.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4323471 | 14.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5568478 | 22.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4323471 | 14.07.1993 |