EP0634879 - Arrangement and method for handling data structures during their flow through a network node [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATecoM GmbH Kaiserstrasse 100 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | For all designated states ASCOM TECH AG Berner Technopark, Morgenstrasse 129 3018 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states ATecoM GmbH Kaiserstrasse 100 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
For all designated states ASCOM TECH AG Berner Technopark, Morgenstrasse 129 CH-3018 Bern / CH | |||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states CADIS GmbH Kaiserstrasse D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Loo, Gerrit-Jan Jr . Josklijnenstraat 5b NL-Heerlen / NL | 02 /
Noll, Joachim Brüsseler Ring 75f D-52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Schwope, Andreas Morsbacher Strasse 23 D-52146 Würselen / DE | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64 D-45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1995/03] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110591.8 | 07.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | DE19934323471 | 14.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4323471 | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634879 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634879 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04L49/3009 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5652 (EP,US);
H04L49/557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Datenstrukturen bei deren Durchlauf durch einen Netzwerkknoten | [1995/03] | English: | Arrangement and method for handling data structures during their flow through a network node | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour le traitement de structures de données lors de leur passage à travers un noeud de réseau | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.1999 | 31.07.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03187646 ; | [Y]WO8909521 (BELL TELEPHONE MFG [BE], et al) [Y] 17 * page 13, line 20 - line 25 *; | [A]US4493021 (AGRAWAL ANIL K [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0436069 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,10,11,13,14,16,18 * column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 5 *; | [A]DE4230744 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911112), vol. 15, no. 444, Database accession no. (E - 1132), & JP03187646 A 19910815 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7-12,15,16,18 * abstract * [Y] 17 |