EP0624036 - Image coding and decoding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Masami, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Inf.Syst.& El. Dev. Lab.,1-1, Ofuna 5 chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kinjo, Naoto, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Inf.Syst. & El. Dev. Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Asano, Kenichi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Communication Syst.Dev.Lab , 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Tokumichi, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Communication Syt.Dev.Lab.,1-1, Ofuna 5 chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Asai, Kohtaro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Communication Syst.Dev.Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Itoh, Atsushi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Communication Syst.Dev.Lab., 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111120.5 | 26.04.1988 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | JP19870105035 | 28.04.1987 Original published format: JP 10503587 | JP19870146649 | 12.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14664987 | JP19870175071 | 14.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17507187 | JP19870190670 | 30.07.1987 Original published format: JP 19067087 | JP19870190671 | 30.07.1987 Original published format: JP 19067187 | JP19870263062 | 19.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26306287 | JP19870332769 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33276987 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624036 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/137 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
G06T9/008 (EP,US);
H03M7/3082 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
H04N19/94 (EP,US);
H04N21/23406 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/45] | Title | German: | System zur Bildcodierung und -decodierung | [1994/45] | English: | Image coding and decoding system | [1994/45] | French: | Système pour le codage et le décodage d'images | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/17] | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88106640.1 / EP0288963 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0193185 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 2,5-8 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 20 * * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 8 * * page 28, line 22 - page 29, line 19 * * page 31, line 22 - page 32, line 23 *; | [Y] - T.UDA ET AL., "Picture coding by an adaptive multistage vector quantization", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (198601), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 75 - 84 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * Section 3.1 on pages 76-77 * * Section 4.1, 4.2 on pages 78-83 * * figures 2,7 * | [A] - K.MATSUDA ET AL., "A study of a vector quantizer for sub-rate video codec", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, NEW YORK , US;, (19861201), vol. 1, pages 261 - 265 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * Section 2.3 on pages 262-263 * * page 264, column L, line 40 - line 53 * * figure 3 * | [A] - P.A.RAMAMOORTHY, "A systolic architecture for real-time composite video image coding", IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, NEW YORK, US;, (19861005), vol. 3, pages 49.6.1 - 49.6.4, XP031444730 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - M.KANEKO ET AL., "Improvement of transform coding algorithm for motion-compensated frame-to-frame difference signals", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, NEW YORK , US;, (19861201), vol. 1, pages 276 - 280 [A] 1 * abstract * * Section 3.3 on page 278 * * figure 2 * |