EP0654535 - Device for germ counting in the clinical field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Johannes Prof. Dr. Lakefeldstrasse 2 D-30952 Ronnenberg-Benthe / DE | 02 /
Slemeyer, Andreas Prof. Dr. Ulmenweg 30 D-35041 Marburg / DE | 03 /
Ricklefs, Ubbo Prof. Dr. Dianaburgstrasse 12 D-35753 Greifenstein / DE | 04 /
Horn, Horst Prausnitzer Strasse 15 D-31832 Springe / DE | [1995/30] |
Former [1995/21] | 01 /
Sander, Johannes Prof. Dr. Lakefeldstrasse 2 D-30952 Ronnenberg-Benthe / DE | ||
02 /
Slemeyer, Andreas Prof. Dr. Ulmenweg 30 D-35041 Marburg / DE | |||
03 /
Ricklefs, Ubbo Prof. Dr. Dianaburgstrasse 12 D-35753 Greifenstein / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118134.9 | 17.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | DE19934339378 | 18.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4339378 | [1995/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654535 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/06 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
A61L2/28 (EP);
G01N21/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Keimzahlbestimmungsanordnung für den klinischen Bereich | [1995/21] | English: | Device for germ counting in the clinical field | [1995/21] | French: | Dispositif de comptage de germes en milieu clinique | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 01.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/49] | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2947040 (RICHTZENHAIN) [A] 1; | [A]DE3916804 (TOYO JOZO CO.,LTD.) [A] 1-14 |