Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.12.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
28.06.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] |
18.06.1996 | Renewal fee | |
10.11.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] |