EP0649097 - An interface between unsynchronised devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briffett, Neil 13 Rosebury Drive Bisley, Woking, Surrey GU24 9RX / GB | 02 /
Elms, Andrew John 93 New Cross Road Guildford, Surrey GU2 6NU / GB | 03 /
Hejdeman, Carl Ron 4 Claudius Drive Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8HY / GB | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Haws, Helen Louise, et al Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Haws, Helen Louise, et al Nokia Mobile Phones, St. George's Court, St. George's Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307207.4 | 30.09.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | GB19930020276 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: GB 9320276 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649097 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649097 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
G06F13/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/19] |
Former [1995/16] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Schnitstelle zwischen unsynchronisierten Geräten | [1995/16] | English: | An interface between unsynchronised devices | [1995/16] | French: | Interfaçage entre dispositifs non-synchronisés | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4935942 (HWANG JIN H [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0279564 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 38; figures 4,6,7 * | [A] - "synchronous external bus architecture", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199301), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 104 - 107 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |