EP0631945 - Security stopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marimon Morales, Jorge Sadurni Pujades 117 E-08430 La Roca Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | [1995/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Pastells Teixido, Manuel Pastells & Aragones, S.L. Pau Claris, 138 5o 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Pastells Teixido, Manuel c/o PASTELLS & ARAGONES, S.L., Pau Claris, 138 E-08009 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 94500099.0 | 06.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | ES19930001793U | 29.06.1993 Original published format: ES 9301793 U | ES19930002327U | 24.08.1993 Original published format: ES 9302327 U | [1995/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0631945 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0631945 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/14 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
B65D50/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/01] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverschluss | [1995/01] | English: | Security stopper | [1995/01] | French: | Fermeture de sûreté | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/20] | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4775061 (COOTE) [X] 1 [Y] 2; | [Y]US3888375 (GERK) [Y] 2 |