EP0702748 - ROTOR BLADE WITH COOLED INTEGRAL PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Dennis, J. 128 Senate Brook Drive Amston, CT 06231-00106 / US | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94900616.7 | 12.11.1993 | [1996/13] | WO1993US10937 | Priority number, date | US19920980850 | 24.11.1992 Original published format: US 980850 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412765 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702748 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702748 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
F01D5/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/13] | Title | German: | ROTORSCHAUFEL MIT GEKÜHLTER INTEGRIERTER PLATFORM | [1996/13] | English: | ROTOR BLADE WITH COOLED INTEGRAL PLATFORM | [1996/13] | French: | AUBE DE ROTOR A PLATEFORME INTEGRALE REFROIDIE | [1996/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 06.09.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 06.09.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.09.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB678085 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]CH343580 (POWER JETS RES & DEV LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2438157 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE); | [A]GB2119027 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [X]EP0278434 (WEINHOLD WOLFGANG P); | [X]GB2253443 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) |