Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0672264
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
17.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
03.04.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |
20.03.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
16.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
05.12.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
21.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
11.04.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] |
18.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.07.1996 |
First examination report |
|
04.08.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] |
04.08.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] |