EP0721303 - SPLITTER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTURY PRODUCTS COMPANY 9600 Valley View Road Macedonia, OH 44056-9989 / US | [1996/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNART, Francis 2940 Bebington Street, N.W. North Canton, OH 44720 / US | [1996/38] |
Former [1996/29] | 01 /
BERNART, Francis 5059 Union Avenue Homeworth, OH 44634 / US | Representative(s) | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921422.5 | 29.06.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994US07353 | Priority number, date | US19930130220 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: US 130220 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509547 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721303 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/02, A44B11/04 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
A44B11/04 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3412 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4093 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4764 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/29] | A44B11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | SCHNALLE MIT EINEM OFFENEN GURTSCHLITZ | [1996/29] | English: | SPLITTER PLATE | [1996/29] | French: | PLAQUE DE REGLAGE DE BOUCLE | [1996/29] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 07.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/19] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR661885 ; | [Y]US2353378 (WHITE PAUL W); | [Y]US2595139 (LUCILLE HART); | [Y]USD285383S (ANTHONY JAMES R); | [XY]EP0465033 (BEDFORD MURRAY R [CA]); | [A]US5177837 (REKUC RICHARD J [US]) |