EP0690463 - Child-proof switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [1998/29] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbst, Johann Borschenweg 4 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | [1996/01] | Application number, filing date | 95104974.1 | 03.04.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | DE19944422809 | 29.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4422809 | [1996/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690463 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690463 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/20 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
H01H3/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Kindersichere Schalteinrichtung | [1996/01] | English: | Child-proof switching device | [1996/01] | French: | Dispositif de commutation à l'épreuve d'enfants | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3939720 (ELEKTRA TAILFINGEN [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE8905409U (H. WILFER) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4331551 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |