Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0843301 | Global Dossier | 16.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13727795 | 10.05.1995 | JP12305394 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0682242 | Global Dossier | 15.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP12305394 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5696580 | 09.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12305394 | 11.05.1994 |