EP0682242 - Method of and apparatus for measuring absorbance, component concentration or specific gravity of liquid sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishi Aketa-cho, Higashi Kujo Minami-ku Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishi Aketa-cho, Higashi Kujo Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Hiroko, c/o Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishi Aketa-cho, Higashi Kujo Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP | 02 /
Kexin, Xu, c/o Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishi Aketa-cho, Higashi Kujo Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP | 03 /
Uenoyama, Harumi, c/o Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co, Ltd 57, Nishi Aketa-cho, Higashi Kujo Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106867.5 | 05.05.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | JP19940123053 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: JP 12305394 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682242 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/41 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
G01N21/4133 (EP,US);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Messung der Extinktion der Komponentenkonzentration oder des spezifischen Gewichts einer Flüssigkeitsprobe | [1995/46] | English: | Method of and apparatus for measuring absorbance, component concentration or specific gravity of liquid sample | [1995/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour mesurer l'absorbance, la concentration de composants ou la gravité spécifique d'un échantillon liquide | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2693796 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]US3797940 (KING R) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 23 - line 32; figure 5 *; | [A]DE4123178 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 7 * column 1; figure 5 *; | [A]FR1583216 (CNRS) [A] 7 * page 4, line 3 - line 9; figure 2 *; | [XP]EP0634642 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [XP] 1,7 * the whole document * |