28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
13.12.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
15.11.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
26.07.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
20.12.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] |
01.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.08.1997 |
First examination report |
|
21.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
10.05.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |
17.11.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] |