EP0690308 - Endotoxin stabilizing agent, endotoxin composition and method for assaying endotoxin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEIKAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA (SEIKAGAKU CORPORATION) 1-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [1996/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Hiroshi 6-13, Nakato 4-chome, Musashimurayama-shi Tokyo 208 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Shigenori 3-15, Ogawanishimachi 5-chome, Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187 / JP | 03 /
Aketagawa, Jun 52-1-22-101, Saiwaicho 4-chome, Tachikawa-shi Tokyo 190 / JP | 04 /
Oda, Toshio 2-3-202, Mukouhara 2-chome, Higashiyamoto-shi Tokyo 207 / JP | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110255.7 | 30.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | JP19940150190 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: JP 15019094 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0690308 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0690308 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690308 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/579, // G01N33/96 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/579 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Endotoxin-Stabilisierungsmittel, Endotoxin-Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Endotoxin | [1996/01] | English: | Endotoxin stabilizing agent, endotoxin composition and method for assaying endotoxin | [1996/01] | French: | Agent stabilisant d'endotoxine, composition d'endotoxine et procédé de dosage d'endotoxine | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 25.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.02.2002 | IT | 06.02.2002 | LI | 06.02.2002 | NL | 06.02.2002 | DK | 06.05.2002 | SE | 06.05.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | CH | 06.02.2002 | |
LI | 06.02.2002 | ||
NL | 06.02.2002 | ||
DK | 06.05.2002 | ||
SE | 06.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | CH | 06.02.2002 | |
LI | 06.02.2002 | ||
NL | 06.02.2002 | ||
SE | 06.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 06.02.2002 | |
LI | 06.02.2002 | ||
SE | 06.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 06.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0513361 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-11 * page 1, line 24 - line 40 * * claim 3 * [A] 5; | [X]EP0569033 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-11 * page 5, line 49 - page 6, line 27 *; | [X]GB958575 (WELLCOME FOUND) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0350273 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * column 10, line 25 - column 12, line 10 *; | [X]EP0552965 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-11 * page 3, line 25 - line 35 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 22 *; | [A]FR2359423 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]) [A] 1,11 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 11 *; | [A]JPS56166124 ; | [E]JPH07191038 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 05, Database accession no. 82-09035E, XP002000792 & JPS56166124 A 19811221 (Y. KATAYAMA) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [E] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 39, Database accession no. 95-295935, XP002000793 & JPH07191038 A 19950728 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD) [E] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | - TAKANORI NAKAMURA, NIPPON SAIKINGAKU ZASSHI: (JAPANESE JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY), (1983), vol. 38, pages 781 - 803 |