EP0703471 - Color filter, production process thereof, and liquid crystal display panel equipped with the color filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eida, Tsuyoshi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shirota, Katsuhiro c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miyazaki, Takeshi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114807.1 | 20.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | JP19940226192 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22619294 | JP19950235112 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23511295 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0703471 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0703471 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703471 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, C09D11/00, B41J2/01 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G02F1/133516 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
G02F1/133512 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/13] | G02B5/20, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/13] | Title | German: | Farbfilter, Herstellungsverfahren desselben, und damit ausgestattete Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel | [1996/13] | English: | Color filter, production process thereof, and liquid crystal display panel equipped with the color filter | [1996/13] | French: | Filtre coloré, procédé de fabrication et panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides équipé avec le filtre | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.12.2002 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2149415 (CANON KK) [A] 1,12,26,31,43-46 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 ** page 2, line 7 - line 13 *; | [XA]JPS6225171 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 26 * abstract * [A] 1,12,31,43-46; | [A]US4701837 (SAKAKI MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,26,31,39,40,43-46 * column 2, line 10 - line 18 * * column 3, line 4 - line 14 * * column 8, line 35 - line 49 * * column 10, line 20 - line 45 *; | [XA]JPS63253302 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 26 * abstract * [A] 1,12,31,43-46; | [YA]US4832984 (HASEGAWA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,11,31 * column 9, line 60 - line 68 * * column 10, line 1 - line 16 * * column 13, line 23 - line 33 * [A] 1,8,12,25,39,43-46; | [XAY]EP0452922 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 26-28 * page 13, line 29 - line 54 * * figures 4,5 * [A] 2,3,12,17,18,25,32,33,40,43-46 [Y] 1,11,31; | [A]WO9324240 (ADVANCED TECH INCUBATOR [US]) [A] 1,12,26,31,37,39,40,43-46 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0603898 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,12,26,31,39,40,43-46 * page 1, line 18 - line 24 * * page 4, line 57 - line 58 * * page 5, line 5 - line 7 * * example - * | Examination | JPS6177014 | JPH03287102 | JPH05288913 | EP0571625 | by applicant | JPS5975205 | JPS63235901 | JPH01217302 | JPH04123005 |