Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0699880 | Global Dossier | 13.01.1999 | B1 | EP0699880 | 11.09.1996 | A3 | EP0699880 | 06.03.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP93110156 | 25.06.1993 | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0699881 | Global Dossier | 13.01.1999 | B1 | EP0699881 | 11.09.1996 | A3 | EP0699881 | 06.03.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP93110156 | 25.06.1993 | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0582817 | Global Dossier | 02.10.1996 | B1 | EP0582817 | 16.02.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4226820 | 17.02.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59304031D1 | 07.11.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59309314D1 | 25.02.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59309315D1 | 25.02.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4226820 | 13.08.1992 | Type | Earlier application | EP0582817 |