EP0699881 - Refrigeration system for cooling down an object to low temperatures by a Joule-Thomson cooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/10] | Refrigeration system for cooling down an object to low temperatures by a joule Thomson cooler | ||
[1999/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BODENSEEWERK GERÄTETECHNIK GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hipper, Roland Barbelgängle D-88662 Überlingen / DE | 02 /
Reischmann, Hans-Ludwig Frohsinnstrasse 8 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | 03 /
Rid, Robert Drosselweg 23 D-88677 Markdorf / DE | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Jürgen, et al Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtraustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, et al Fuggerstrasse 26 D-10777 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116849.1 | 25.06.1993 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | DE19924226820 | 13.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4226820 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0699881 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0699881 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699881 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/02 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
F25B9/02 (EP);
G01J5/041 (EP);
G01J5/061 (EP);
G05D23/1919 (EP);
G05D23/1921 (EP);
G05D23/1925 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/10] | Title | German: | Kühlsystem zum Abkühlen eines Kühlobjektes auf tiefe Temperaturen mittels eines Joule-Thomson-Kühlers | [1996/10] | English: | Refrigeration system for cooling down an object to low temperatures by a Joule-Thomson cooler | [1999/02] | French: | Système frigorifique pour le refroidissement d'un objet à des basses températures par un refroidisseur Joule-Thomson | [1999/02] |
Former [1996/10] | Refrigeration system for cooling down an object to low temperatures by a joule Thomson cooler | ||
Former [1996/10] | Système frigorifique pour le refroidissement d'un objet à des basses températures par un refroidisseur joule Thomson | Examination procedure | 05.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93110156.2 / EP0582817 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2193799 (HYMATIC ENG CO LTD) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 92 - page 4, line 86; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]JPH06117788 ; | [A]JPH05899575 ; | [A]JPH05725573 ; | [DA]GB1238470 (THE HYMATIC ENGINEERING) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 28; figure . *; | [DA]EP0245164 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [DA] 1 * column 6, line 2 - line 54; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP0098646 (LEUVEN RES & DEV VZW [BE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 30 - page 11, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4766740 (BRADLEY LAURIE [GB], et al); | [A]JPS61227141 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860613), vol. 10, no. 167, Database accession no. (M - 488), & JP6117788 A 19860125 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830903), vol. 7, no. 199, Database accession no. (M - 240), & JP5899575 A 19830613 (SHARP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820527), vol. 6, no. 89, Database accession no. (M - 132), & JP5725573 A 19820210 (FUJI KOKI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870303), vol. 11, no. 69, Database accession no. (C - 407), & JP61227141 A 19861009 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | GB238470 | EP0245164 |