Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0694422
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
30.07.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
03.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.05.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.10.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
22.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.04.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] |
07.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.1996 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] |
04.01.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] |