Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0694422 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | B1 | EP0694422 | 28.05.1997 | A3 | EP0694422 | 31.01.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | EP92304831 | 28.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5143159 | 01.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5190111 | 02.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5291407 | 01.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5320186 | 14.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0523834 | Global Dossier | 14.08.1996 | B1 | EP0523834 | 20.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0517426 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1996 | B1 | EP0517426 | 13.01.1993 | A3 | EP0517426 | 09.12.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0517419 | Global Dossier | 13.09.1995 | B1 | EP0517419 | 13.01.1993 | A3 | EP0517419 | 09.12.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69204749T | 04.04.1996 | T2 | DE69204749D1 | 19.10.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69212242T | 19.12.1996 | T2 | DE69212242D1 | 22.08.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69212737T | 23.01.1997 | T2 | DE69212737D1 | 19.09.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69230009T | 20.01.2000 | T2 | DE69230009D1 | 21.10.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75717391 | 10.09.1991 | US70918591 | 03.06.1991 | US70918491 | 03.06.1991 | US70923791 | 03.06.1991 | US70923691 | 03.06.1991 | Type | Earlier application | EP0517426 |