EP0694422 - Wheel speed calibration system for tractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon Essex SS14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macqueene, James W. 2706 Gateshead Dr. Naperville, IL 60564 / US | 02 /
Swierenga, Garrett E. 322 N. Cass Avenue Westmont, Illinois 60559 / US | [1996/16] |
Former [1996/05] | 01 /
Macqueene, James W. 6148 Knollwood Road No. 306 Willowbrook, Illinois 60514 / US | ||
02 /
Swierenga, Garrett E. 322 N. Cass Avenue Westmont, Illinois 60559 / US | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 95202650.8 | 28.05.1992 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19910709237 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709237 | US19910709236 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709236 | US19910709184 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709184 | US19910709185 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709185 | US19910757173 | 10.09.1991 Original published format: US 757173 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0694422 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0694422 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694422 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/42, A01B63/112, E02F9/20 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
B60D1/42 (EP);
A01B63/112 (EP);
A01B63/114 (EP);
E02F9/2029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/05] | Title | German: | Radgeschwindigkeits-Eichungsystem für Traktor | [1996/05] | English: | Wheel speed calibration system for tractor | [1996/05] | French: | Système d'étalonnage de vitesse de roue pour tracteurs | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92304831.8 / EP0517426 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4846283 (BATCHELLER BARRY D [US], et al) [AD] 1,8 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 33; figure - *; | [A]US4282933 (SUGANAMI TAKASHI, et al) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 66; figure - *; | [A]DE3612763 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0092316 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 5; figure - * | by applicant | US4846283 | US5291407 | - SAE TECHNICAL PAPER NO. 901561 - DEVELOPMENT OF THE ELECTRONIC DRAFT CONTROL SYSTEM FOR THE FORD NEW HOLLAND 8210 TRACTOR |