EP0728247 - GLAZING SYSTEM FOR BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCANDINAVIAN LICENCE AB Fiskhamnsgatan 10 414 55 Göteborg / SE | [1999/30] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states SCANDINAVIAN LICENCE AB Fiskhamnsgatan 10 S-414 55 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THULESKÄR, Börje Badhusgatan 10 453 30 Lysekil / SE | 02 /
LUNDGREN, Jerker Värmlandsgatan 20 413 28 Göteborg / SE | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 95900979.6 | 09.11.1994 | [1996/35] | WO1994SE01055 | Priority number, date | SE19930003704 | 10.11.1993 Original published format: SE 9303704 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513439 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728247 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728247 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/96, E04D3/08 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
E04B2/962 (EP,KR,US);
E04D3/06 (FI);
E04B2/96 (FI);
E04D3/08 (FI);
E06B3/5427 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | VERGLASUNGSSYSTEM FÜR GEBÄUDE | [1996/35] | English: | GLAZING SYSTEM FOR BUILDINGS | [1996/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE VITRAGE POUR BATIMENTS | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.07.1999 | [2008/35] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3439436 (SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE3626194 (SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE4015166 (GLASBAU SEELE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3813274 ; | [A]US5199236 (ALLEN GLENN R [CA]) |