EP0693991 - PROCESS FOR BRAZING ALUMINUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/05] | ALUMINUM-LITHIUM FILLER ALLOY FOR BRAZING | ||
[2001/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaiser Aluminium & Chemical Corporation 5847 San Felipe, Suite 2600 Houston, TX 77057 / US | [2002/13] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 6177 Sunol Boulevard Pleasanton, California 94566-7769 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHILDREE, David L. 533 Hazel Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911576.7 | 31.01.1995 | [1996/05] | WO1995US00978 | Priority number, date | US19940195067 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 195067 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521741 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693991 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693991 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/20, F28F21/08, B23K35/26, B23K101/14, B23K103/10 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
F28F21/084 (EP,US);
B23K35/0238 (EP,US);
B23K35/286 (EP,US);
B32B15/016 (EP,US);
Y10S165/905 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/05] | Title | German: | PROZESS ZUM LÖTEN VON ALUMINIUM | [2001/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR BRAZING ALUMINUM | [2001/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE BRASAGE D'ALUMINIUM | [2001/29] |
Former [1996/05] | ALUMINIUM-LITHIUMZUSATZMETAL ZUM HARTLÖTEN | ||
Former [1996/05] | ALUMINUM-LITHIUM FILLER ALLOY FOR BRAZING | ||
Former [1996/05] | METAL D'APPORT POUR BRASAGE EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM-LITHIUM | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2002 | SE | 17.07.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/42] | SE | 17.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS617088 ; | [X]JPS53119762 ; | [X]JPS6238796 ; | [A]JPS5794543 ; | [A]JPS5792157 ; | [X]US3081534 (BREDZS NIKOLAJS T) [X] 1,6,15 * claim 2 *; | [A]DE1148754 (VER LEICHTMETALLWERKE GMBH) [A] 1,6,15 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE2820413 (FURUKAWA ALUMINIUM) [X] 1,6,15 * example 1 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860603), vol. 010, no. 153, Database accession no. (M - 484), & JP61007088 A 19860113 (SUMITOMO KEIKINZOKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,6,15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 47, Database accession no. 78-84795A, XP002025542 & JPS53119762 A 19781019 (KOBE STEEL KK) [X] 1,6,15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870722), vol. 011, no. 225, Database accession no. (M - 609), & JP62038796 A 19870219 (FURUKAWA ALUM CO LTD) [X] 1,6,15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 29, Database accession no. 82-60406E, XP002025543 & JPS5794543 A 19820612 (NISHIMURA M) [A] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 28, Database accession no. 82-58625E, XP002025544 & JPS5792157 A 19820608 (NISHIMURA M) [A] * abstract * | International search | [Y]GB832791 (MARSTON EXCELSIOR LTD); | [A]US3272624 (QUAAS JOSEPH F); | [Y]US3859145 (MCGLASSON DONALD S, et al); | [A]US4172181 (KAWASE HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4173302 (SCHOER HEINZ [DE], et al); | [Y]JPS59100249 (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD); | [A]US4721653 (ODA HIDETAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US5069980 (NAMBA KEIZO [JP], et al) |