blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0749399

EP0749399 - FOAM DISPENSING GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHH FOAM SYSTEMS, INC.
6001 South Pennsylvania Avenue, P.O. Box 752
Cudahy, WI 53110-0752 / US
[1996/52]
Inventor(s)01 / FINN, Clifford, J.
2825 North 80th Street
Milwaukee, WI 53222 / US
[1996/52]
Representative(s)Lippert, Hans, et al
Jung HML
Patentanwälte
Emil-Claar-Strasse 20
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Holtz Martin Lippert Emil-Claar-Strasse 20
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1998/39]Lippert, Hans
Holtz Martin Lippert, Emil-Claar-Strasse 20
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1996/52]Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13
60322 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date95912721.810.03.1995
[1996/52]
WO1995US02707
Priority number, dateUS1994021915129.03.1994         Original published format: US 219151
[1996/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9526315
Date:05.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0749399
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0749399
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.10.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1997
ClassificationIPC:B67D5/52
[1996/52]
CPC:
B05B1/3066 (EP,US); B05B12/0026 (EP,US); B05B7/0408 (EP,US);
B29B7/7404 (EP); B29B7/7438 (EP,US); B05B7/1209 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/52]
TitleGerman:SCHAUMAUFTRAGPISTOLE[1996/52]
English:FOAM DISPENSING GUN[1996/52]
French:PISTOLET DISTRIBUTEUR DE MOUSSE[1996/52]
Entry into regional phase16.10.1996National basic fee paid 
16.10.1996Search fee paid 
16.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
IT02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2003/45]CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2002/26]CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2000/52]CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
Former [2000/50]CH08.05.2000
LI08.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US3801009  (MARSHALL J) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 47 - line 65 * * column 5, line 21 - line 52; figure - *;
 [A]DE4213826  (WALTHER SPRITZ LACKIERSYST [DE]) [A] 1,11* abstract *
International search[A]US3558051  (STRICKLER JAY H, et al);
 [A]US4350298  (TADA TETSUYA);
 [A]US4901888  (STANDLICK RONALD E [US]);
 [A]US5092492  (CENTEA MARK E [US]);
 [X]US5129581  (BRAUN ROBERT [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.