EP0752063 - MULTIPLE DISK AIR ASSIST ATOMIZER FOR FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Jingming, J. 907 Elder Road Newport News, VA 23602 / US | 02 /
WARNER, Vernon, R. P.O. Box 358 Wicomico, VA 23184 / US | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Roke Manor Old Salisbury Lane Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | ||
Former [1997/02] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95912885.1 | 09.03.1995 | [1997/02] | WO1995US03074 | Priority number, date | US19940217589 | 24.03.1994 Original published format: US 217589 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525889 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752063 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752063 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02M69/04, F02M61/18 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
F02M61/1853 (EP,US);
F02M69/047 (EP,US);
F02M51/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/02] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHEIBENDRUCKLUFTZERSTÄUBER FÜR BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE | [1997/02] | English: | MULTIPLE DISK AIR ASSIST ATOMIZER FOR FUEL INJECTOR | [1997/02] | French: | ATOMISEUR A ASSISTANCE PNEUMATIQUE ET A DISQUES MULTIPLES POUR INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5174505 (SHEN JINGMING J [US]) [DY] 1-10 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 63; figure - *; | [Y]EP0476298 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9308384 (HITACHI LTD [US]) [A] 1 * page 21, line 26 - page 22, line 17; figure 9 * |