EP0793441 - PATIENT OPERATED TONOMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDS Technologies L.L.C. Unit 605, 396 Fenton Lane, P.O. Box 370 West Chicago, IL 60186-0370 / US | For all designated states Zeimer, Ran C. 12601 Sagamore Forest Lane Reisterstown, MD 21136 / US | For all designated states Jost, George J. 183 Hilltop Drive Lake In The Hills, IL 60102 / US | For all designated states Bainbridge, Robert C. 24 William Lane Sandwich, IL 60548 / US | For all designated states Ware, Charles Apartment D, 540 Country Ridge Drive Warrenville, IL 60540 / US | For all designated states Zebrowski, Kathleen DePaul Apartment 107, 16 W. 500 Honeysuckle Rose Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | For all designated states Schwarzbach, Richard 1334 Winchester Court Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEIMER, Ran, C. 12601 Sagamore Forest Lane Reisterstown, MD 21136 / US | 02 /
JOST, George, J. 183 Hilltop Drive Lake In The Hills, IL 60102 / US | 03 /
BAINBRIDGE, Robert, C. 24 William Lane Sandwich, IL 60548 / US | 04 /
WARE, Charles Apartment D 540 Country Ridge Drive Warrenville, IL 60540 / US | 05 /
ZEBROWSKI, Kathleen, DePaul Apartment 107 16 W. 500 Honeysuckle Rose Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 06 /
SCHWARZBACH, Richard 1334 Winchester Court Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Jackson, Robert Patrick, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95937630.2 | 25.10.1995 | [1997/37] | WO1995US13777 | Priority number, date | US19940330981 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 330981 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613198 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793441 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, A61B3/16 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
A61B3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/37] | Title | German: | DURCH DEN PATIENTEN ZU BETÄTIGENDES TONOMETER | [1997/37] | English: | PATIENT OPERATED TONOMETERS | [1997/37] | French: | TONOMETRES ACTIONNES PAR LE PATIENT | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 28.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 16.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/21] | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.1998 | 31.10.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4159019 (DE FARIAS NATALICIO L [BR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 42 - line 57 * * column 3, line 18 - line 53 * [A] 2; | [YA]US4872460 (NISHIO KOUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 2 * [A] 2 | International search | [X]US5190042 (HOCK BERTRAM [DE]); | [X]US4951671 (COAN WILLIAM M [US]); | [X]US5203331 (DRAEGER JOERG [DE]); | [Y]US5100227 (WINOCUR JOSEPH [US]); | [Y]US5070875 (FALCK FRANCIS Y [US], et al) |