EP0739423 - MESOSCALE POLYNUCLEOTIDE AMPLIFICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania Center for Technology Transfer 3700 Market Street Suite 300 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA Center for Technology Transfer, 3700 Market Street, Suite 300 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDING, Peter 208 Darby Road Paoli, PA 19301 / US | 02 /
KRICKA, Larry J. 886 Nathan Hale Road Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95941393.1 | 13.11.1995 | [1996/44] | WO1995US14823 | Priority number, date | US19940338728 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 338728 | US19940338380 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 338380 | US19940338369 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 338369 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615269 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0739423 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739423 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01L3/00, B01L7/00 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
B01D61/18 (EP);
B01D71/0213 (EP,US);
B01D71/0215 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP);
B01L3/502746 (EP);
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
B01J2219/00826 (EP);
B01J2219/00828 (EP);
B01J2219/00831 (EP);
B01J2219/00833 (EP);
B01J2219/00873 (EP);
B01J2219/00952 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/0864 (EP);
B01L2300/087 (EP);
B01L2400/086 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/44] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR AMPLIFIKATION VON POLYNUKLEOTIDEN IM MESOMASSSTAB | [1996/44] | English: | MESOSCALE POLYNUCLEOTIDE AMPLIFICATION DEVICES | [1996/44] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'AMPLIFICATION DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES A MESO-ECHELLE | [1996/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 30.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.01.2002 | PT | 16.04.2002 | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/06] | PT | 16.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4280498 (JENSEN MARVIN E); | [A]US4824247 (TRUE KAREN J [US], et al); | [X]EP0318255 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]WO9313220 (TEPNEL MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [DX]WO9322058 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | [XDXY]WO9405414 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [AY]EP0611598 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]); | [Y]US5346672 (STAPLETON MARILYN J [US], et al); |