EP0738659 - Container for agricultural food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPER PLAST LTD. 14, Gissin Street Petach-Tikva 49100 / IL | [1996/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mindel, Enrique 5/15 Hachayal Ha'Almoni Street Rishon Letzion, 75254 Israel / IL | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl Viale Bianca Maria 33 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96105992.0 | 17.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | IL19950113406 | 17.04.1995 Original published format: IL 11340695 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738659 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/38, B65D43/16, B65D85/34 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
B65D43/162 (EP);
B65D1/38 (EP);
B65D85/34 (EP);
B65D2251/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [1996/43] | Title | German: | Behälter für landwirtschaftliche Produkte | [1996/43] | English: | Container for agricultural food products | [1996/43] | French: | Récipient pour produits agricoles | [1996/43] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2649991 (WOOCK WALTER R J) [Y] 6,7,12 * column W *; | [A]US3900129 (SCHOLZ WILLIAM A) [A] 1-5* column W *; | [XY]US4606471 (QUERCETTI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [X] 1-5,8,13 * column W * [Y] 6,7,9-12,14-16; | [A]US4989744 (TOMINAGA KAZUTOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column W *; | [Y]US5016777 (MARVIN MORLEY [US]) [Y] 14,15 * column 1, paragraph 3; figure 2 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 6 *; | [Y]DE9213085U (F. MUSCATI) [Y] 9-11,16 * the whole document *; | [XP]US5465901 (PAINE JR DERRICK [US]) [XP] 1-7,10,13,15,16 * column W * |