Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] |
28.02.2001 | Application refused | |
21.07.2000 | First examination report | |
20.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant | |
14.07.2000 | Renewal fee | |
30.08.1999 | Renewal fee | |
16.07.1998 | Renewal fee | |
17.01.1997 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] |
17.01.1997 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] |
26.09.1996 | PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid | |
26.09.1996 | PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |