EP0760269 - Device to remove welding flash for tubes or profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graefe, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Hamerweg 315 41068 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Bonsmann, Manfred Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113376.6 | 21.08.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | DE1995132835 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19532835 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760269 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23D79/02, B23B27/12 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
B23D79/023 (EP,US);
B23B27/12 (EP,US);
Y10T409/501804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Innenentgraten längsnahtgeschweisster Rohre oder Profile | [1997/10] | English: | Device to remove welding flash for tubes or profiles | [1997/10] | French: | Dispositif à débravurer des tubes ou profiles soudés | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/35] | 15.03.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1912419 (WHITMAN FRED H) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 43 - line 79; figure 1 *; | [YA]GB154642 (ROBERT WOODALL, et al) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 78 - page 3, line 44; figures 1,4 * [A] 2,7,8; | [A]GB783175 (LASALLE STEEL CO) [A] 8 * page 3, line 90 - line 104; figure 2 *; | [A]AT333572B (VOEST AG [AT]); | [A]AU4736472 (TUBEMAKERS AUSTRALIA); | [A]DE135970 (REICHMANN) | by applicant | DE3347146 | DE2103400 | JPS63282349 |